VA SB126 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Waiver of payment of interest on fines and costs; incarcerated defendant. Provides for the purging of interest on fines and costs in criminal and traffic cases for an incarcerated defendant when such fines and costs have accrued on cases other than the one for which the defendant is incarcerated. Current law provides for the interest waiver only for the case for which the defendant is incarcerated.
Title
Incarcerated defendant; waiver of payment of interest on fines and costs accrued.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-26 | House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10102456D-E | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB126E | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102456D |