VA SB1255 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1255
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation Commission; issuance or renewal of insurance licenses or registrations during an emergency. Authorizes the State Corporation Commission to temporarily suspend, authorize extensions of time for, or waive requirements for the issuance or renewal of licenses or registrations related to insurance in the event of an emergency. State Corporation Commission; issuance or renewal of insurance licenses or registrations during an emergency. Authorizes the State Corporation Commission to temporarily suspend, authorize extensions of time for, or waive requirements for the issuance or renewal of licenses or registrations related to insurance in the event of an emergency.
Title
SCC; issuance or renewal of insurance licenses or registrations during an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1255ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101068D-E |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1255E |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101068D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1255 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote