VA SB1243 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-06 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-06 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Parental Choice Education Savings Accounts established. Permits the parent of a public preschool, elementary, or secondary school student who meets certain criteria to apply to the school division in which the student resides for a one-year, renewable Parental Choice Education Savings Account that consists of an amount that is equivalent to a certain percentage of all applicable annual Standards of Quality per pupil state funds appropriated for public school purposes and apportioned to the resident school division in which the student resides, including the per pupil share of state sales tax funding in basic aid and any state per pupil share of special education funding to which the student is eligible. The bill permits the parent to use the moneys in such account for certain education-related expenses of the student, including tuition, deposits, fees, and required textbooks at a private, sectarian or nonsectarian elementary or secondary school or preschool that is located in the Commonwealth and does not discriminate on the basis of race, color, or national origin. The bill also contains provisions relating to auditing, rescinding, and reviewing expenses made from such accounts.
Title
Va. Parental Choice Education Savings Accounts; established, definitions, report, effective clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17104318D-ES1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1243ES1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104318D-S1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104318D-S1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102447D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 222.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 222.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |