VA SB1240 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; short-term, limited-duration plans. Authorizes health insurance carriers in the Commonwealth to offer short-term, limited-duration health plans. Short-term, limited-duration health plans are defined as plans that have an expiration date that is less than 12 months after the original effective date of the contract, policy, or plan and, taking into account renewals or extensions, have a duration that does not exceed 36 months. Short-term health plans are required to include a specified disclaimer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; short-term, limited-duration plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateRequires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
2019-04-03SenateMotion to pass in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 18-N)
2019-03-22 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1240ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House (51-Y 46-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1240S1
2019-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106064D-S1
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106064D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100803D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1240
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1240+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1240S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1240ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0083+SB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1240+SB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1240+SB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0348SB1240+SB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0176+SB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2764+SB1240
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1160SB1240+SB1240

Bill Comments

feedback