VA SB1236 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Personal property tax; advertising signs. Provides that outdoor advertising signs constitute a separate class of personal property for purposes of assessment, and requires localities to tax such signs as personal property, not as real property. The bill also prohibits such signs or income generated by such signs to be considered in assessing the value of real property. The bill states that an emergency exists and it is in force from its passage. The bill applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2013.
Title
Personal property tax; advertising signs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 652 (effective 3/20/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1236ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #2 |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1236S1 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104422D-S1 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104422D-S1 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/13 13101715D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1860 (Same As) 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Subjects
Advertising and Advertisements
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Personal Property and Personal Property Tax
Taxation
Trade and Commerce
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Personal Property and Personal Property Tax
Taxation
Trade and Commerce