VA SB1232 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administration and enforcement of cigarette laws. Modifies several provisions relating to the administration and enforcement of Virginia's cigarette laws by prohibiting persons convicted of certain offenses from being authorized holders, requiring the Office of the Attorney General to place on its website a list of individuals ineligible to be an authorized holder, and authorizing additional entities to audit and inspect records of persons receiving, storing, selling, handling, or transporting cigarettes. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission and is identical to
Title
Administration and enforcement of cigarette laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 20-N) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 754 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1232ER2) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 20-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (75-Y 20-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1232ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House (63-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (13-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102591D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 4206.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |