VA SB1230 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Opiate prescriptions; electronic prescriptions. Requires a prescription for any controlled substance containing an opiate to be issued as an electronic prescription and prohibits a pharmacist from dispensing a controlled substance that contains an opiate unless the prescription is issued as an electronic prescription, beginning July 1, 2020. The bill defines electronic prescription as a written prescription that is generated on an electronic application in accordance with federal regulations and is transmitted to a pharmacy as an electronic data file. The bill requires the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to convene a work group of interested stakeholders to review actions necessary for the implementation of the bill's provisions, to evaluate hardships on prescribers and the inability of prescribers to comply with the deadline for electronic prescribing, and to make recommendations for any extension or exemption processes relative to compliance or disruptions due to natural or manmade disasters or technology gaps, failures, or interruptions of services. The work group shall report on the work group's progress to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by November 1, 2017, and a final report to such Chairmen by November 1, 2018.
Title
Opiate prescriptions; electronic prescriptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 429 (effective - see bill) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1230ER) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House with amendments (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101418D-E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1230E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101418D |
Subjects
Computer Services and Uses
Controlled Substances
Electronic Processes
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Prescription Medicines
Professions and Occupations
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Controlled Substances
Electronic Processes
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Prescription Medicines
Professions and Occupations
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |