VA SB1218 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle emissions inspection program; autocycles. Exempts autocycles that have not been emissions certified with an on-board diagnostic system by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency from the motor vehicle emissions inspection program.
Title
Autocycles; exempted from motor vehicle emissions inspection program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 95 (effective - 7/1/15 see bill) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1218ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15100683D-E |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1218E |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100683D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1341 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)