VA SB1209 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Patient care team podiatrist definition; physician assistant supervision requirements. Establishes the role of "patient care team podiatrist" as a provider of management and leadership to physician assistants in the care of patients as part of a patient care team. The bill modifies the supervision requirements for physician assistants by establishing a patient care team model. The bill directs the Board of Medicine to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill and is identical to HB 1952.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient care team; podiatrists and physician assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
2019-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 92 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-13SenateSigned by President
2019-02-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1209ER)
2019-02-12SenateEnrolled
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1209S1
2019-01-21SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19104787D-S1
2019-01-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-21SenateRead second time
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 19104787D-S1
2019-01-11SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-01-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101643D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412900(n/a)See Bill Text
5412951.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412952.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412953(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback