VA SB1201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation of public service corporations; electric suppliers; storage. Amends the definition of electric supplier to include certain battery storage facilities with a storage capacity greater than 25 megawatts and subjects such facilities to central assessment by the State Corporation Commission. The bill also requires battery storage facilities qualifying as electric suppliers to file an annual report to the Commission. Taxation of public service corporations; electric suppliers; storage. Amends the definition of electric supplier to include certain battery storage facilities with a storage capacity greater than 25 megawatts and subjects such facilities to central assessment by the State Corporation Commission. The bill also requires battery storage facilities qualifying as electric suppliers to file an annual report to the Commission. The bill also defines "energy storage system" as equipment, facilities, or devices that are capable of absorbing energy, storing it for a period of time, and redelivering that energy after it has been stored. The bill provides that energy storage systems shall be considered certified pollution control equipment and facilities and shall be exempt from local property taxation. The tax exemption applies only to certain projects with alternating current (AC) storage capacity of more than five megawatts and less than 150 megawatts. The bill also provides that a locality may assess a revenue share of up to $1,400 per megawatt of alternating current (AC) storage capacity on energy storage systems.
Title
Public service corporations; amends definition of electric supplier.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1201S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103742D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103742D-S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100749D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1201 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote