VA SB1201 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1201
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax exemptions for energy storage systems. Declares that energy storage systems are included in the definition of certified pollution control equipment and facilities, making energy storage systems exempt from state and local taxation. The bill defines "energy storage system" as equipment, facilities, or devices that are capable of absorbing energy, storing it for a period of time, and redelivering that energy after it has been stored. The tax exemption applies only to certain projects with alternating current (AC) storage capacity of more than five megawatts and less than 150 megawatts. Tax exemptions for energy storage systems. Declares that energy storage systems are included in the definition of certified pollution control equipment and facilities, making energy storage systems exempt from state and local taxation. The bill defines "energy storage system" as equipment, facilities, or devices that are capable of absorbing energy, storing it for a period of time, and redelivering that energy after it has been stored. The tax exemption applies only to certain projects with alternating current (AC) storage capacity of more than five megawatts and less than 150 megawatts. The bill also allows localities to assess a revenue share of up to $1,400 per megawatt on energy storage systems. The bill provides that on July 1, 2026, and every five years thereafter, the maximum amount of the revenue share that a locality may impose on energy storage systems as well as certain solar energy projects shall be increased by 10 percent. No increase may be made to any revenue share imposed by a locality on a solar energy project or energy storage systems for which an application has been filed with the locality and such application has been approved prior to January 1, 2021. The bill defines energy storage systems as electric suppliers whose property shall be assessed by the State Corporation Commission.
Title
Energy storage systems; definitions, tax exemption, revenue share for systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 50 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 22, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1201ER) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2021-02-15 | House | Passed House (91-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1201S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103742D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103742D-S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100749D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1201 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
HB2006 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
HB2006 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)