VA SB1198 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1198

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; license plate readers. Prohibits law-enforcement and regulatory agencies from using license plate readers to collect and maintain personal information on individuals without a warrant. The bill provides that license plate data may be collected if intended for prompt evaluation and potential use in investigating suspected criminal activity, civil or regulatory violations, or terrorism, or in support of the emissions inspection program of the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV). The data may only be retained for 30 days and shall not be subject to any outside inquiries or internal usage except for the investigation of a report of a missing person, suspected criminal activity, civil or regulatory violations, or terrorism by any person. The bill also prohibits an agency from acquiring personal information collected from license plate readers from a third-party private vendor if the agency would not have been permitted to collect or retain the information on its own, unless such license plate reader technology is being utilized as part of the DMV's emissions inspection program. Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; license plate readers. Prohibits law-enforcement and regulatory agencies from using license plate readers to collect and maintain personal information on individuals without a warrant. The bill provides that license plate data may be collected if intended for prompt evaluation and potential use in investigating suspected criminal activity, civil or regulatory violations, or terrorism, or in support of the emissions inspection program of the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV). The data may only be retained for 30 days and shall not be subject to any outside inquiries or internal usage except for the investigation of a report of a missing person, suspected criminal activity, civil or regulatory violations, or terrorism by any person. The bill also prohibits an agency from acquiring personal information collected from license plate readers from a third-party private vendor if the agency would not have been permitted to collect or retain the information on its own, unless such license plate reader technology is being utilized as part of the DMV's emissions inspection program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; license plate readers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 4-N 3-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseLeft in Communications, Technology and Innovation
2021-02-23HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2021-02-23HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2021-02-22HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-19HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-18HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-17HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-16HouseRead second time
2021-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 21200129D-H1
2021-02-12HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
2021-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N)
2021-02-03SenateSubstitute bill reprinted 21104029D-S1
2021-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1198S1
2021-02-03SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-03SenateSubstitute by Senator Petersen agreed to 21104029D-S1
2021-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-03SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2021-02-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-03SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateFloor substitute printed 21104029D-S1 (Petersen)
2021-02-02SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 4-N 3-A)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100940D

Same As/Similar To

SB1198 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223800(n/a)See Bill Text
223801(n/a)See Bill Text
223802(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1198
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1198+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1198S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1198H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1198AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1198ASR
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200129D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1198F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1198FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1198FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0030+SB1198
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0184SB1198+SB1198
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0300SB1198+SB1198
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1502V0004+SB1198
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H15V0001+SB1198

Bill Comments 750

feedback