VA SB1198 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1198
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; license plate readers. Prohibits law-enforcement and regulatory agencies from using license plate readers to collect and maintain personal information on individuals without a warrant. The bill provides that license plate data may be collected if intended for prompt evaluation and potential use in investigating suspected criminal activity, civil or regulatory violations, or terrorism, or in support of the Department of Motor Vehicle's (DMV) emissions inspection program. The data may only be retained for 30 days and shall not be subject to any outside inquiries or internal usage except for the investigation of a report of a missing person, suspected criminal activity, civil or regulatory violations, or terrorism by any person. The bill also prohibits an agency from acquiring personal information collected from license plate readers from a third-party private vendor if the agency would not have been permitted to collect or retain the information on its own, unless such license plate reader technology is being utilized as part of the DMV's emissions inspection program. Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; license plate readers. Prohibits law-enforcement and regulatory agencies from using license plate readers to collect and maintain personal information on individuals without a warrant. The bill provides that license plate data may be collected if intended for prompt evaluation and potential use in investigating suspected criminal activity, civil or regulatory violations, or terrorism, or in support of the Department of Motor Vehicle's (DMV) emissions inspection program. The data may only be retained for 30 days and shall not be subject to any outside inquiries or internal usage except for the investigation of a report of a missing person, suspected criminal activity, civil or regulatory violations, or terrorism by any person. The bill also prohibits an agency from acquiring personal information collected from license plate readers from a third-party private vendor if the agency would not have been permitted to collect or retain the information on its own, unless such license plate reader technology is being utilized as part of the DMV's emissions inspection program.
Title
Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; license plate readers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 4-N 3-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 4-N 3-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Substitute bill reprinted 21104029D-S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1198S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Petersen agreed to 21104029D-S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21104029D-S1 (Petersen) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 4-N 3-A) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100940D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1198 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |