VA SB1188 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Weapon of terrorism; definition; penalty. Includes any mixture or substance containing a detectable amount of fentanyl, including its isomers, esters, ethers, salts, and salts of isomers, as a weapon of terrorism for the purpose of defining terrorism offenses. The bill provides that any person who knowingly and intentionally manufactures or knowingly and intentionally distributes a weapon of terrorism when such person knows that such weapon of terrorism is, or contains, any mixture or substance containing a detectable amount of fentanyl is guilty of a Class 4 felony.
Title
Weapon of terrorism; definition, penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Travis Hackworth [R] |
Sen. Ryan McDougle [R] | Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. Thomas Norment [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (50-Y 42-N) (Y: 50 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1188ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (50-Y 42-N) |
2023-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (50-Y 42-N) |
2023-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2023-02-23 | House | Delegates: Wyatt, Adams, L.R., Delaney |
2023-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Petersen, Edwards |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | House requested conference committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2023-02-20 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed House with substitute (51-Y 48-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1188H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106691D-H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106691D-H1 |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 9-N) |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1188S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105839D-S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105839D-S1 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103853D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1682 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
HB1682 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
HB1682 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)