VA SB1182 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0359)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meetings held through electronic communication means. Clarifies that certain requirements of current law regarding participation in public meetings through electronic communication means do not apply to meetings held to address a state of emergency declared by the Governor, specifically the requirements that public bodies (i) adopt a written policy regarding participation by electronic communication, (ii) have a quorum of a public body physically assembled at a primary or central location, and (iii) make arrangements for the voice of any member participating from a remote location to be heard by all persons at the primary or central location. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meetings held through electronic communication means.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0359)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 359 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1182ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateAssigned GL&T sub: #1
2019-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100886D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223708.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1182
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1182+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1182ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0359+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0064+SB1182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1182+SB1182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1182+SB1182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0036+SB1182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0268+SB1182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2933+SB1182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2976+SB1182

Bill Comments

feedback