VA SB118 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public School Improvement Program. Creates the Virginia Public School Improvement Program to offer more educational options and flexibility for parents, teachers, and students. The bill authorizes local school boards to designate or approve any public school within its school division to participate in the Program, if (i) it has not applied for, converted to, or received permission from the local school board to operate as a public charter school, or (ii) a majority of parents and teachers of students at the school have petitioned the school board to participate in the Program, or (iii) the school board has determined that, notwithstanding having satisfied the requirements of the Standards of Learning and Standards of Accreditation, less than 81 percent of the students enrolled in a public school within the school division have failed to demonstrate proficiency in reading and less than 79 percent of the students enrolled have failed to demonstrate proficiency in mathematics for three consecutive school years. Local school boards would continue to receive state basic school aid funding for such schools; participating schools would be exempt from certain school division policies and state regulations, but would have to meet SOQ, SOL, SOA, and certain federal requirements; participation can be rescinded by petition of a majority of parents and teachers, violation of the contract with the local school board, or failure of students to achieve satisfactory academic progress each year for two consecutive school years. The Board of Education must establish guidelines to assist school boards in implementing the Program in the school division and provide technical assistance to school boards upon request.
Title
Virginia Public School Improvement Program; established.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100178D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 212.16:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.16:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |