VA SB117 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Opening and closing motor vehicle doors. Requires drivers to wait for a reasonable opportunity to open vehicle doors on the side adjacent to moving traffic. A violation constitutes a traffic infraction punishable by a fine of not more than $50.
Title
Motor vehicle doors; operator to wait for a reasonable opportunity to open.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 25-N) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (10-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (10-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 607 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB117ER) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 25-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed House (70-Y 25-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 8-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB117S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104851D-S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104851D-S1 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (10-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2015-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100874D |