VA SB1156 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Writ of habeas corpus; service; dismissal of petition. Specifies the proper respondent to be named in a writ of habeas corpus based upon whether the petitioner is in prison or jail, is on parole or probation, or has a suspended sentence. The bill also provides for amendment of the petition if the petitioner does not name a proper respondent and provides that the habeas petition shall be dismissed without prejudice if the petitioner fails to name a proper respondent within the time allotted by the court.
Title
Writ of habeas corpus; service; of writ, dismissal of petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 554 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1156ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102307D |