VA SB1153 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1153
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee voting; ballots to be sorted and results to be reported by precinct. Provides that absentee ballots processed at a central absentee precinct must be sorted by the precinct to which the voter who cast the absentee ballot is assigned and that the resulting vote totals from such ballots must be reported separately for each voter precinct.
Title
Absentee voting; ballots to be sorted and results to be reported by precinct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101986D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1153 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote