VA SB1153 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; absentee voting; ballots to be sorted and results to be reported by precinct. Provides that absentee ballots processed at a central absentee precinct must be sorted by the precinct to which the voter who cast the absentee ballot is assigned and that the resulting vote totals from such ballots must be reported separately for each voter precinct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; ballots to be sorted and results to be reported by precinct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N)
2021-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101986D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242712(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback