VA SB1149 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-06 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-06 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing home standards of care and staff requirements; regulations. Requires the State Board of Health to establish staffing and care standards in nursing homes to require a minimum of direct care services to each resident per 24-hour period as follows: (i) a minimum of one registered nurse or licensed practical nurse per 15 patients and one certified nursing assistant per eight patients during the daytime; (ii) a minimum of one registered nurse or licensed practical nurse per 20 patients and one certified nursing assistant per 12 patients during the evening; and (iii) a minimum of one registered nurse or licensed practical nurse per 30 patients and one certified nursing assistant per 15 patients during the nighttime. Such requirements may not apply during a health crisis, emergency, or during an outbreak of a communicable disease of public health threat. The bill requires nursing homes to complete a criminal background check on each employee prior to the start of employment and every five years thereafter that the employee remains employed. The bill also requires nursing homes to provide quarterly staff training on first aid, medication administration, and compliance with nursing home policies and procedures.
Title
Nursing homes; standards of care and staff requirements, regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-06 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101862D |