VA SB1116 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Laboratory results; authority to receive directly. Allows a laboratory, with authorization from patient, to provide a copy of the report of the results directly to the insurance carrier, health maintenance organization, or self-insured plan that provides health insurance or similar coverage to the patient.
Title
Laboratory results; authority to provide directly to insurance carrier, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0849) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 849 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1116ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1116ER) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103770D-E | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1116E | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103770D |