VA SB1115 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1115
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp; federal hemp producer license; emergency. Updates Virginia's industrial hemp laws to address the new hemp producer license issued by the U.S. Department of Agriculture. The bill changes drug laws to exclude the industrial hemp possessed by a federally licensed hemp producer from the definition of "marijuana" and to exclude certain amounts of tetrahydrocannabinol (THC) in such industrial hemp from the prohibition on THC. The bill exempts federally licensed hemp producers from state industrial hemp registration requirements and adds such producers to the list of those eligible to receive funds from the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund. Industrial hemp; federal hemp producer license; emergency. Updates Virginia's industrial hemp laws to address the new hemp producer license issued by the U.S. Department of Agriculture. The bill changes drug laws to exclude the industrial hemp possessed by a federally licensed hemp producer from the definition of "marijuana" and to exclude certain amounts of tetrahydrocannabinol (THC) in such industrial hemp from the prohibition on THC. The bill exempts federally licensed hemp producers from state industrial hemp registration requirements and adds such producers to the list of those eligible to receive funds from the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund. The bill makes other changes to industrial hemp laws, including (i) excluding from the definition of "dealer" any retail establishment that sells a completed product containing industrial hemp; (ii) making optional the monitoring and random testing of industrial hemp by the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services and authorizing the random sampling of such hemp; (iii) removing the requirement that the Attorney General of the United States be notified when a Virginia grower, dealer, or processor exceeds the federal THC limit; and (iv) directing the Commissioner to adopt regulations establishing a fee structure for registration. Finally, the bill exempts employees of the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services from prosecution for possession or distribution of industrial hemp when possession is necessary in the performance of their duties. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Industrial hemp; increases maximum THC concentration.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1115S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103790D-S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103790D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101447D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1115 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote