VA SB1115 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1115
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp; federal hemp producer license; emergency. Updates Virginia's industrial hemp laws to address the new hemp producer license issued by the U.S. Department of Agriculture. The bill changes drug laws to exclude the industrial hemp possessed by a federally licensed hemp producer from the definition of "marijuana" and to exclude certain amounts of tetrahydrocannabinol (THC) in such industrial hemp from the prohibition on THC. The bill exempts federally licensed hemp producers from state industrial hemp registration requirements and adds such producers to the list of those eligible to receive funds from the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund. Industrial hemp; federal hemp producer license; emergency. Updates Virginia's industrial hemp laws to address the new hemp producer license issued by the U.S. Department of Agriculture. The bill changes drug laws to exclude the industrial hemp possessed by a federally licensed hemp producer from the definition of "marijuana" and to exclude certain amounts of tetrahydrocannabinol (THC) in such industrial hemp from the prohibition on THC. The bill exempts federally licensed hemp producers from state industrial hemp registration requirements and adds such producers to the list of those eligible to receive funds from the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund. The bill makes other changes to industrial hemp laws, including (i) excluding from the definition of "dealer" any retail establishment that sells a completed product containing industrial hemp; (ii) making optional the monitoring and random testing of industrial hemp by the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services and authorizing the random sampling of such hemp; (iii) removing the requirement that the Attorney General of the United States be notified when a Virginia grower, dealer, or processor exceeds the federal THC limit; and (iv) directing the Commissioner to adopt regulations establishing a fee structure for registration. Finally, the bill exempts employees of the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services from prosecution for possession or distribution of industrial hemp when possession is necessary in the performance of their duties. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Industrial hemp; increases maximum THC concentration.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (75-Y 21-N 2-A) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 23-N 1-A) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (75-Y 21-N 2-A) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 23-N 1-A) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Failed to pass |
2021-03-01 | Senate | No further action taken |
2021-02-25 | House | Delegates: Simon, Sullivan, Marshall |
2021-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Ruff, McClellan, Peake |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | House requested conference committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | VOTE: Adoption (75-Y 21-N 2-A) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendment (75-Y 21-N 2-A) |
2021-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB1115H1 |
2021-02-19 | House | Amendment by Delegate Gilbert agreed to |
2021-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-18 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House |
2021-02-18 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (74-Y 23-N 1-A) |
2021-02-18 | House | Defeated by House (74-Y 23-N 1-A) |
2021-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1115H1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104490D-H1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104490D-H1 |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1115S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103790D-S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103790D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101447D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1115 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote