VA SB1111 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; preservation of order at the polls; powers of officers of election. Removes the power of officers of election, in the event that no law-enforcement officer is in attendance, to appoint a person who is not a law-enforcement officer to have all the powers of a law-enforcement officer within the polling place and the prohibited area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; preservation of order at the polls, powers of officers of election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2020-12-15SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-12-15SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101169D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242606(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback