VA SB1111 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1111
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; preservation of order at the polls; powers of officers of election. Removes the power of officers of election, in the event that no law-enforcement officer is in attendance, to appoint a person who is not a law-enforcement officer to have all the powers of a law-enforcement officer within the polling place and the prohibited area.
Title
Elections; preservation of order at the polls, powers of officers of election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 6 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 22, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1111ER) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101169D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1111 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote