VA SB1103 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes. Provides that individual votes of the members of the Virginia Parole Board shall be public records and subject to the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes.
Sponsors
Sen. David Suetterlein [R] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. Thomas Norment [R] |
Sen. Mark Obenshain [R] | Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2021-02-10 | House | In Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N) |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100488D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1103 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote