VA SB1103 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes. Provides that individual votes of the members of the Virginia Parole Board shall be public records and subject to the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
2021-01-29SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
2021-01-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N)
2020-12-02SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-12-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100488D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223703(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback