VA SB1078 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1078
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; federal accountability indicators; PSAT/NMSQT; PreACT. Directs the Department of Education to amend its state plan pursuant to the Every Student Succeeds Act to include the Preliminary SAT/National Merit Scholarship Qualifying Test and the PreACT in the next federal accountability indicators application. The bill directs the Department and the Board of Education to grant verified credit to students who have earned approved scores on these two tests and permit schools to count those students as a "pass."
Title
Federal accountability indicators; PSAT/NMSQT, PreACT.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105591D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1078 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)