VA SB1076 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; recount procedures. Provides that in a recount when ballots are rerun through optical scan tabulators, the total number of ballots counted by the tabulator and the total number of ballots set aside by the tabulator must equal the total number of ballots rerun through the tabulator. If this requirement is not met, all the optical scan ballots for the precinct must be counted by hand.
Title
Elections; recount procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 522 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1076ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House (93-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102524D |