VA SB1070 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage licenses for certain properties. Authorizes the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board to grant a mixed beverage license, notwithstanding the outcome of the mixed beverage referendum, on property within the boundary of any town incorporated in 1875 located adjacent to the intersection of Interstate 81 and Route 91 (the Town of Glade Spring).
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage licenses for certain properties in Town of Glade Spring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 17-N) (Y: 84 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 633 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1070ER) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 17-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed House (83-Y 17-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2013-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102267D |