VA SB1066 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Vacancies in elected offices; terms of office; special elections. Prohibits a special election to fill a vacancy in an office from being held on the same day as the general election at which that office is regularly scheduled to be filled. The bill further prohibits an election to fill a vacancy in the representation of the Commonwealth in the United States Congress from being ordered or held if the general or special election at which it is to be called is scheduled within 75 days of the end of the term of the office to be filled. The bill provides that the term of office of any person who is elected at a general election to an office that is vacant at the time of the election shall begin when the person so elected has qualified and taken the oath of office.
Title
Elected offices; term of officer elected to fill vacancy, filling vacancies in U.S. Senate & House.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1066ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105574D-S2 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-25 | House | Delegates: Cole, Miller, Krupicka |
2015-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Reeves, Smith |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-20 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute (98-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1066H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105082D-H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105082D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1066S1 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15103969D-S1 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15103969D-S1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100828D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1296 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor