VA SB1046 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0136)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0136)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Benefits consortium for localities. Authorizes the governing bodies of three or more cities, counties, or school boards, if they composed the membership of a multiple employer welfare arrangement on December 31, 2014, to form a benefits consortium for the purpose of establishing a self-funded employee welfare benefit plan. The benefits consortium will be a nonstock corporation established to operate a benefits plan. Each member of the benefits consortium shall be contractually liable for its allocated share of the consortium's liabilities. The benefits consortium will be exempt from taxation and from insurance regulations.
Title
Benefits consortium; formation of a not-for-profit consortium by localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional readings dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional readings dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0136) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 136 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1046ER) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Title replaced 15105106D-H1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1046H1 |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105106D-H1 |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105106D-H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred from Fin. (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103138D |