VA SB1042 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1042

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Wills; presumption of undue influence. Codifies the common law test for establishing undue influence upon a testator in the execution of a will. The bill further provides that if evidence is presented to establish the elements required for such a presumption, a jury sitting as trier of fact shall be instructed that it may presume that the will was executed under undue influence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wills; presumption of undue influence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-02-24HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105429D

Same As/Similar To

SB1042 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
642454.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback