VA SB1035 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0984)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0984)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers; motorcycle franchises. Redefines "relevant market area" for purposes of motorcycle franchises. The bill also removes the burden of proof from a motor vehicle dealer in a hearing related to a motorcycle franchise license.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers; redefines "relevant market area" for purposes of motorcycle franchises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0984) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 984 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1035ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendments (70-Y 30-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1035S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107143D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107143D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105325D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1573.36 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |