VA SB1021 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cigarette and other tobacco products taxes; electronic transactions. Authorizes (i) the Attorney General and the Department of Taxation to accept electronic filing of reports by stamping agents and manufacturers and (ii) the Department of Taxation to allow electronic purchase of cigarette tax stamps.
Title
Cigarette and other tobacco products taxes; electronic transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1021ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13102144D-E |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1021E |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102144D |