VA SB102 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal acts committed during a close pursuit; arrest warrant. Provides that if a law-enforcement officer makes an arrest without a warrant when in close pursuit and such arrest is made beyond the boundary of the county or city from which the arrestee fled, then the law-enforcement officer shall procure a warrant from the magistrate serving the county or city wherein the arrest was made, charging the accused with the offense committed in the county or city from which he fled and any offense committed during the close pursuit in the county or city where such offense was committed. Under current law, such officer would not be able to obtain a warrant from the magistrate serving the county or city wherein the arrest was made for a criminal act committed during the close pursuit beyond the boundary of the county or city from which the arrestee fled. Criminal acts committed during a close pursuit; arrest warrant. Provides that if a law-enforcement officer makes an arrest without a warrant when in close pursuit and such arrest is made beyond the boundary of the county or city from which the arrestee fled, then the law-enforcement officer shall procure a warrant from the magistrate serving the county or city wherein the arrest was made, charging the accused with the offense committed in the county or city from which he fled and any offense committed during the close pursuit in the county or city where such offense was committed. Under current law, such officer would not be able to obtain a warrant from the magistrate serving the county or city wherein the arrest was made for a criminal act committed during the close pursuit beyond the boundary of the county or city from which the arrestee fled.
Title
Arrest warrant; offenses committed during a close pursuit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 326 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB102ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (84-Y 14-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendments (84-Y 14-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (15-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 by voice vote |
2022-02-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102857D |