VA SB1010 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disclosure of information. Authorizes the Department of Taxation to disclose (i) whether a person, firm, or corporation is registered as a retail sales and use tax dealer and whether a certificate of registration number for such tax is valid, (ii) to the developer or the economic development authority of a tourism project tax information facilitating the repayment of gap financing, and (iii) tax information to a private entity with which the Department has contracted to assist in the administration of the refund process. The bill also allows the Attorney General and the Tax Commissioner to disclose tax information relating to sellers and purchasers of cigarettes or other tobacco products to a federal, state, or local agency.
Title
Taxation, Department of; disclosure of information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1010ER) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House (96-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15103062D-E |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1010E |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103062D |