VA SB1010 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Identity theft; penalties. Raises the punishment for identity theft where five or more persons' identifying information has been obtained, recorded, or accessed in the same transaction or occurrence from a Class 6 to a Class 5 felony and raises the punishment for identity theft where 50 or more persons' identifying information has been obtained, recorded, or accessed in the same transaction or occurrence from a Class 5 to a Class 4 felony. A violation resulting in the arrest and detention of the victim is raised from a Class 6 to a Class 5 felony.
Title
Identity theft; victim assistance, restitution, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Blank Action (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Blank Action (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1010ER) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1010S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104444D-S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104444D-S1 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101634D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1684 (Same As) 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 152.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 152.5:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3:01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3:02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 59 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 349 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 70.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
42 | 1 | 86.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4018.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |