VA SB1005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Community services boards and behavioral health authorities; services to be provided. Provides that, effective July 1, 2019, the core of services provided by community services boards and behavioral health authorities shall include (i) same-day access to mental health screening services and (ii) outpatient primary care screening and monitoring services for physical health indicators and health risks and follow-up services for individuals identified as being in need of assistance with overcoming barriers to accessing primary health services. The bill provides that, effective July 1, 2021, the core of services provided by community services boards and behavioral health authorities shall include (a) crisis services for individuals with mental health or substance use disorders, (b) outpatient mental health and substance abuse services, (c) psychiatric rehabilitation services, (d) peer support and family support services, (e) mental health services for members of the armed forces located 50 miles or more from a military treatment facility and veterans located 40 miles or more from a Veterans Health Administration medical facility, (f) care coordination services, and (g) case management services. The bill also requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to report annually regarding progress in the implementation of the bill. This bill is identical to HB 1549.
Title
Community services boards and behavioral health authorities; services to be provided, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 607 (effective - see bill) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1005ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-25 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 17105898D-S2 |
2017-02-25 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Farrell, Jones, Torian |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Hanger, Cosgrove, Barker |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | House requested conference committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1005H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105339D-H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105339D-H1 |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1005S1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105039D-S1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105039D-S1 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101412D |