VA HR31 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Bill text as passed House (HR31ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Bill text as passed House (HR31ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Tony Hackenberg.
Title
Commending Tony Hackenberg.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Bill text as passed House (HR31ER) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-14 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12105272D | |
2012-01-15 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12105272D |