VA HJR947 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ947ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ947ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Falls Church Chamber of Commerce.
Title
Commending the Falls Church Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] |
Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ947ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-02-14 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17105205D |