VA HJR933 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ933ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ933ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Nicole K. Mittendorff.
Title
Celebrating the life of Nicole K. Mittendorff.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] |
Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ933ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-02-13 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17100059D |