VA HJR910 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 64-34)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Frank Medico.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Frank Medico.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-02-10 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2017-02-09 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17103691D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HJ910 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HJ910+hil |