VA HJR845 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ845ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ845ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Yvonne Elizabeth Spain.
Title
Celebrating the life of Yvonne Elizabeth Spain.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ845ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received |
2019-02-11 | House | Agreed to by House |
2019-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-02-06 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19102173D |