VA HJR77 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ77ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ77ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Center for Innovative Technology; feasibility of a statewide dig once policy; report. Directs the Secretary of the Commerce and Trade to request the Center for Innovative Technology (CIT) to study the feasibility of a statewide dig once policy, including the installation of conduits with bridge construction projects. In conducting its study, CIT shall examine the feasibility of a blanket policy for all nine of the Virginia Department of Transportation (VDOT) districts and shall consult various stakeholders, such as the Virginia Broadband Advisory Council, VDOT, telecommunication and cable providers, and utility providers.
Title
Statewide dig once policy; CIT to study feasibility of policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ77ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading waived |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ77H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106533D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Taken up |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106533D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104687D |