VA HJR75 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ75ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ75ER)
Summary
Study; local incentives to private businesses; report. Establishes a joint subcommittee to study local incentives provided to private businesses for economic development purposes. In conducting its study, the joint subcommittee shall (i) determine all incentives that localities are permitted to provide to private businesses; (ii) evaluate the impact of such incentives on smaller local competitors of the businesses provided the incentives; and (iii) evaluate the effectiveness of the incentives that are provided.
Title
Businesses, private; joint subcommittee to study local incentives provided for economic development.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ75ER) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-02-08 | House: Taken up | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082526544 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ75 |