VA HJR746 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Paul Gagnon.
Title
Celebrating the life of Paul Gagnon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House |
2015-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-04 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15103553D |