VA HJR715 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HJR715

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-13)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ715ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Valerie Braxton-Williams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Valerie Braxton-Williams.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ715ER)
2021-02-11SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2021-02-11SenateTaken up for immediate consideration
2021-02-11SenateDischarged from Rules
2021-02-11SenateRules suspended (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules
2021-02-05SenateRereferred to Rules
2021-02-05SenateMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2021-02-05SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2021-02-05SenateReceived
2021-02-04HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House
2021-02-02HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 21103597D

Same As/Similar To

HJR715 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback