VA HJR712 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ712ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ712ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Commonwealth University School of Education.
Title
Commending the Virginia Commonwealth University School of Education.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. George Loupassi [R] | Del. James Massie [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ712ER) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Received |
2015-01-30 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-01-26 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15100666D |